Robertson, Archibald (CPSO#: 28369)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1987
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1999

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Feb 1986
Summary:

 In February 1986, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Robertson guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain 
 the standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Robertson be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register; that his 
 licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months; and that, if the Doctor failed to 
 attend for his reprimand, the period of suspension would be extended a further three months.  The 
 Committee also ruled that following the three month suspension, a restriction be placed on Dr. 
 Robertson's licence, prohibiting him from practicing surgery.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 26 Feb 1986