Robertson, Donald David (CPSO#: 62252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 508
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 527-0123
Fax: (905) 527-3192
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Dr. D. Robertson ( CPSO# 62252 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
508 - 1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 527-0123

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DONALD DAVID ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991