Robertson, Duncan (CPSO#: 24426)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996