Robertson, Jeffery Haig (CPSO#: 51692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Canadian Medical
Protective Association
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Fax: (613) 725-1300
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY HAIG ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1984