Robertson, John William (CPSO#: 23801)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011