Robertson, Julia Ann (CPSO#: 76985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baawaating Family Health Team
210C Gran Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 0C4
Phone: (705) 575-7191
Fax: (705) 575-7193
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julia Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Robertson ( CPSO# 76985 )

Business Address:
Baawaating Family Health Team
210C Gran Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 0C4
Phone Number: (705) 575-7191

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ANN ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2001 to 21 Sep 2001
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2002