Robertson, Kerri Duff (CPSO#: 21362)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-342-1052
Date Received: 09 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018