Robertson, Lynne (CPSO#: 64812)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1992