Robertson Moore, Rohanne Kristine (CPSO#: 72566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Robertson, Rohan Kristine (used until: 25 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peter Lougheed Centre
Department Of Psychiatry
3200 - 26 Street N E
Calgary AB  T1Y 6J4
Phone: (403) 943-4710

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROHANNE KRISTINE ROBERTSON MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004