Robertson-More, Connal Teague (CPSO#: 108180)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Dec 2015 to 17 Jan 2016
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2016