Robes, Reynaldo Perez (CPSO#: 78869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Universit of The City of Manila, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Rd. #6
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone: (416) 431-7100
Fax: (416) 431-7191
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

935 SHEPPARD AVENUE WEST, UNIT 1-3
North York ON  M3H 2T7
Canada
Phone: (647) 352-6188
Fax: (647) 352-9288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reynaldo P. Robes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Robes ( CPSO# 78869 )

Business Address:
Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Road Unit 6
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 431-7100

Business Address:
935 Sheppard Avenue East
Suites 1 2 and 3
North York ON  M3H 2T7
Phone Number: (647) 352-6188

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REYNALDO PEREZ ROBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006