Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Robichaud, Jeff Marcel (CPSO#: 70445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
23 Hannover Drive
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Phone: (905) 685-0267
Fax: (905) 685-0265
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeff M. Robichaud, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Robichaud ( CPSO# 70445 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
23 Hanover Drive
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 685-0267

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFF MARCEL ROBICHAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBICHAUD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2001