Robinette, Michael Allan (CPSO#: 27639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
The Toronto Hospital, General Div
11 - 1264 N C S B
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3855
Fax: (416) 340-4500
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Urology Associates
123 Edward Street
Suite1401 & 1404
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 970-9000
Fax: (416) 970-9002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.A.Robinette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robinette ( CPSO# 27639 )

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Suite 11-PMB 186
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3855

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
5th Floor CC
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3045

Business Address:
123 Edward Street
Suite 1401, 1404
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 979-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLAN ROBINETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINETTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1975