Robinson, Andrew George (CPSO#: 75214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Ctr of Southeastern Ontario
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Robinson ( CPSO# 75214 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Regional Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW GEORGE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2001 to 29 Jul 2001
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2001 to 24 Aug 2001
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2002 to 14 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004