Robinson, Catherine Alexandra (CPSO#: 79378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 344-1365
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Robinson ( CPSO# 79378 )

Business Address:
200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ALEXANDRA ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006