Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Robinson, Clifford Lorne (CPSO#: 59232)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.L. Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital, 170 Colborne Street West, Orillia, ON L3V 2Z3
Date Received: 01 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015