Robinson, David Jeffrey (CPSO#: 58302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Mental Health Association
648 Huron Street
Psychiatric Clinic
London ON  N5Y 4J8
Phone: (519) 434-919
Fax: (519) 668-2227
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Leonard's Community Services
405 Dundas St.
London ON  N6B 1V9
Canada
Phone: 5198503777
Fax: 5198501396
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Crest Support Services
13570 Elginfield Road
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Canada
Phone: 5192276766
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Central Lambton Family Health Team
4130 Glenview Road
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
Phone: 519-882-2500
Fax: 519-882-4321
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David J. Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson ( CPSO# 58302 )

Business Address:
PMB 203
11 - 1673 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 2N3
Phone Number: (519) 667-2335

Business Address:
Canadian Mental Health Association
648 Huron Street
London ON  N5Y 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 434-9191

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JEFFREY ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1988