Robinson, Donna Lynn (CPSO#: 62151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-1150
Fax: (416) 256-0742
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bauer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson ( CPSO# 62151 )
Dr. R. Levitan ( CPSO# 57352 )
Dr. R. Bauer ( CPSO# 57297 )

Business Address:
Cardiovascular Centre
Main Floor
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 245-1150

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA LYNN ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992