Robinson, Eric Jean (CPSO#: 58386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Robinson ( CPSO# 58386 )

Business Address:
2 - 2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-9101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Jan 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC JEAN ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1992