Robinson, Gregory Allan (CPSO#: 51423)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Nov 2014