Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Robinson, Helen Marie (CPSO#: 54021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: Van Leeuwen, Helen Marie (used until: 25 Jul 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
268 Clarence Street
London ON  N6B 2K1
Phone: (519) 672-9898
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN MARIE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1986