Robinson, Katherine Sue (CPSO#: 57666)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Apr 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 1988