Robinson, Lisa Annette (CPSO#: 63945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Room 5265
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 206289
Fax: (416) 813-6271
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANNETTE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992