Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Robinson, Marie-Brigitte (CPSO#: 60750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-BRIGITTE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1993