Robinson, Michael John (CPSO#: 67941)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2016