Robinson, Philip (CPSO#: 74288)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 08 Oct 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2000