Robison, Gordon Edward Archibald (CPSO#: 59635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gordon Robison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Robison ( CPSO# 59635 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 961-6044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON EDWARD ARCHIBALD ROBISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989