Robles, Melanie Ann (CPSO#: 64130)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Names: Duplessis-Robles, Melanie Ann (used until: 14 Sep 2006 )     Duplessis, Melanie Ann (used until: 19 Jul 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2008