Robson, Daniel Guy (CPSO#: 81557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 640-0892
Fax: (416) 640-1243
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Robson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robson ( CPSO# 81557 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 640-0892

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL GUY ROBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2004
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2007