Robson, Michael Gavin (CPSO#: 54406)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1994