Rocca, Antonio Stevereves (CPSO#: 77977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
Cardiology
Unit B10
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 243
Fax: (416) 645-1979
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeshore Cardiology
100 Martindale Road
Suite 2
St Catharines ON  L2S 2Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 937-2011
Fax: (905) 937-4520
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Michael Garron Hospital
Division of Cardiology
825 Coxwell
East York ON  M4C 2E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd,
Department of Medicine
Cardiology Program
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Division of Cardiology
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antonio Rocca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rocca ( CPSO# 77977 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Business Address:
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
Cardiology
B10 - 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Lakeshore Cardiology
100 Martindale Road
Suite 2
St Catharines ON  L2S 2Y3
Phone Number: (905) 937-2011

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO STEVEREVES ROCCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006