Rocha, Tristana Mylene (CPSO#: 73488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: Stein, Tristana Mylene (used until: 29 Oct 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: (905) 889 1125
Fax: (905) 889 4216
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISTANA MYLENE ROCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 05 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2003