Roche, Mark James (CPSO#: 58624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Roche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roche ( CPSO# 58624 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JAMES ROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 May 1999 to 28 May 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Nov 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003