Rochon, Luc Joseph Wilfrid (CPSO#: 31955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 745-8633
Fax: (613) 745-8715
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luc Rochon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rochon ( CPSO# 31955 )

Business Address:
595 Chemin Montreal
Suite 403
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 745-8633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUC JOSEPH WILFRID ROCHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1984