Rochon, Marie-Helene (CPSO#: 82694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
535 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V1
Phone: (613) 746-5350
Fax: (613) 746-5340
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marie-Helene Rochon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rochon ( CPSO# 82694 )

Business Address:
535 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V1
Phone Number: (613) 746-5350

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-HELENE ROCHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007