Rochon, Paula Ann (CPSO#: 52440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 351-3732 Ext. 2711
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. A. Rochon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rochon ( CPSO# 52440 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA ANN ROCHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985