Rock, Terri Lee (CPSO#: 61864)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Texas Tech University School of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009