Rock, William John (CPSO#: 22715)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Rock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 270 Sandridge Rd Ottawa ON K1L 5A2
Date Received: 04 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017