Rockman, Gerald Lewis (CPSO#: 51502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Dec 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2560 Gerrard Street East
Suite 202
Scarborough ON  M1N 1W8
Phone: (416) 690-2285
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerald Rockman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rockman ( CPSO# 51502 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
2560 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M1N 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 690-2285

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD LEWIS ROCKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCKMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1984