Rodd, Celia Jane (CPSO#: 59085)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1993