Roddy, Janet Elizabeth (CPSO#: 57525)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2010