Rodenburg, Martinus (CPSO#: 18278)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Leiden, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1995