Rodger, Norman Wilson (CPSO#: 20781)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 323 St George St London ON N6A 3A9
Date Received: 10 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018