Rodgers, Gemma Arielle (CPSO#: 100558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodgers Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rodgers ( CPSO# 100558)
Dr. S. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 100722)

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEMMA ARIELLE RODGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODGERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015