Rodgman, Graeme Melville (CPSO#: 52894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay St
Pembroke, ON
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graeme Rodgman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rodgman ( CPSO# 52894 )

Business Address:
1100 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke ON  K8A 6Y7
Phone Number: (613) 668-6310

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 668-6310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME MELVILLE RODGMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODGMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984