Rodin, Gary Michael (CPSO#: 27164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Supportive Care
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4504
Fax: (416) 946-2047
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Michael Rodin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rodin ( CPSO# 98171 )
Dr. G. Rodin ( CPSO# 27164 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychosocial Oncology
and Palliative Care
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 16-724 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4504

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY MICHAEL RODIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976