Rodin, Rachel Lee (CPSO#: 74995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
785 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: 613-957-3488
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL LEE RODIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009