Rodis, Belinda Angie (CPSO#: 112526)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Sep 2017 to 22 Oct 2017
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2017