Rodrigue, Julie Marie (CPSO#: 69151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 21
5350 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9E2
Phone: (613) 695-5560
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Rodrigue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rodrigue ( CPSO# 69151 )

Business Address:
21 - 5350 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9E2
Phone Number: (613) 695-5560

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE MARIE RODRIGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1998