Rodrigues, Jude Francis Noel (CPSO#: 55259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 May 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
871 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2C9
Phone: (519) 254-4833
Fax: (519) 254-3692
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jude Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rodrigues ( CPSO# 55259 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
871 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2C9
Phone Number: (519) 254-4833

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDE FRANCIS NOEL RODRIGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1985